TN HB2036 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 941
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the Tennessee Task Force on Auction Law Modernization. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates the Tennessee Task Force on Auction Law Modernization. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 19.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 941
2018-04-16HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
2018-04-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-10HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/12/2018
2018-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
2018-04-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018
2018-04-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-13HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/13/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/6/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/27/2018
2018-02-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 2/27/2018
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/20/2018
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2081 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 941

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback