TN HB2033 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires each state agency to submit, on or before December 1 of each year, a report to members of the finance, ways and means committees summarizing amounts of federal block grants and purposes for which funds were expended, including any unexpended or returned portions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 9, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires each state agency to submit, on or before December 1 of each year, a report to members of the finance, ways and means committees summarizing amounts of federal block grants and purposes for which funds were expended, including any unexpended or returned portions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 9, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-06-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-06-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 20, PNV 0
2020-06-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0973)
2020-06-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020
2020-06-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-15HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020
2020-03-18HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-11HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/18/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/11/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-02-03HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1803 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback