TN HB2024 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2020-02-03HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2020-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1786 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback