TN HB2024 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 884
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 884
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises and makes permanent and applicable statewide the Knox County pilot project that allows indigent criminal defendants to pay their court costs and litigation taxes through the performance of public service. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, revises and makes permanent and applicable statewide the Knox County pilot project that allows indigent criminal defendants to pay their court costs and litigation taxes through the performance of public service. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 884 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0939) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1078) |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2063 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 884