TN HB2023 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a landlord or person in control of a residential rental property to provide a case manager from the department of children's services or a child protective investigation team with information on the address or location of a child who has been alleged to be abused or neglected and resides or is located on the residential rental property; grants immunity from liability for a cooperating landlord, except in cases of willful or wanton conduct or intentional wrongdoing. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 39, relative to child abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971 | |
2022-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/14/2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1910 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022