TN HB2021 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that all employees working directly with students of an LEA or public charter school must complete an annual child abuse training program identified by the department of education or that meets the guidelines established by the department of children's services. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-408 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 37-1-408 and Title 49, relative to child abuse training programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR #2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR #2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 841 | |
2022-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0653) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-31 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0721) |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | R/S H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 3/31/22 |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2815 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 841