TN HB2008 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class E felony of communicating a threat to commit an act of mass violence on school property or at a school-related activity; creates the Class A misdemeanor of knowing failure to report a threat of mass violence on school property or at a school-related activity. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class E felony of communicating a threat to commit an act of mass violence on school property or at a school-related activity; creates the Class A misdemeanor of knowing failure to report a threat of mass violence on school property or at a school-related activity. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 39 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] |
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2780 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee