TN HB2005 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the notice period that a commissioner is entitled to prior to a hearing to defend charges that may result in the commissioner's removal from not less than 10 business days before the hearing to not less than 14 business days before the hearing. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, extends the notice period that a commissioner is entitled to prior to a hearing to defend charges that may result in the commissioner's removal from not less than 10 business days before the hearing to not less than 14 business days before the hearing. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2020-06-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0783) |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2773 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Refer to Senate Cal. Comm.