TN HB2004 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department to investigate reports of the amount of diagnoses of cancer and Parkinson's disease based on data currently available to the department in Maury County and Lawrence County; requires the department to submit a report to legislative committees no later than July 1, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 68, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 68, Chapter 1, relative to public health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 680
2024-03-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2024-03-25HouseComp. SB subst.
2024-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024
2024-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024
2024-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2024-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2024
2024-03-05HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2024-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024
2024-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2024-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2024-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1843 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback