TN HB1989 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the Interstate Compact Between the States of Arkansas, Mississippi, and Tennessee Creating the RegionSmart Development District and the RegionSmart Development Agency of the Greater Memphis Region. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 54 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 54 and Title 67, relative to an interstate compact between the states of Arkansas, Mississippi, and Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1915 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.