TN HB1984 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows a person providing services pursuant to a contract to bring a sexual harassment action against the entity for which the person is under contract in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows a person providing services pursuant to a contract to bring a sexual harassment action against the entity for which the person is under contract in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-29HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2130 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback