TN HB1982 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-16 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires only an applicant for a marriage license who is under the age of 18 to provide the name and address of the applicant's parents, guardian, or next of kin. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-104.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 36-3-104, relative to the issuance of marriage licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-16HouseWithdrawn.
2024-01-25HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2024-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2024-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback