TN HB1974 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to maintain staffing levels of case managers so that each region has enough case managers to allow caseloads not to exceed an average of 12 active cases relating to initial assessments, 12 children monitored and supervised in active cases relating to ongoing in-home services, or 13 children in active cases in which the children are in out-of-home placements relating to ongoing services. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1900 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee