TN HB1974 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the state board of education to assess reasonable costs against a teacher or administrator when a final order is issued following a contested case hearing in which a teacher or administrator is issued a formal reprimand or the teacher's or administrator's license is denied, non-renewed, suspended, or revoked; requires the state board to promulgate rules for such assessments. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 4 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, permits the state board of education to assess reasonable costs against a teacher or administrator when a final order is issued following a contested case hearing in which a teacher or administrator is issued a formal reprimand or the teacher's or administrator's license is denied, non-renewed, suspended, or revoked; requires the state board to promulgate rules for such assessments. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 4 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 734 | |
2020-06-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-19 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2261 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 734