TN HB1973 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TennCare to create and implement a three-year pilot program to provide remote patient monitoring services for maternal health to eligible TennCare recipients; authorizes the TennCare director to seek a federal waiver as necessary to implement the pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to maternal health services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1906 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee