TN HB1973 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies procedures for selecting a delegation to attend conventions of states and for determining the instructions for the delegation; imposes duties on the members of the delegation. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, specifies procedures for selecting a delegation to attend conventions of states and for determining the instructions for the delegation; imposes duties on the members of the delegation. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2452 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.