TN HB1971 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Failed in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Failed in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a school or LEA to issue required textbooks to all students; requires the director of schools to certify to the commissioner of education by October 15 of each year that all students have been issued all required textbooks. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires a school or LEA to issue required textbooks to all students; requires the director of schools to certify to the commissioner of education by October 15 of each year that all students have been issued all required textbooks. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Failed in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2027 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee