TN HB1969 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Protect Tennessee Citizens and Workers Act." - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 68.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Protect Tennessee Citizens and Workers Act." - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2267 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1969&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1969.pdf |