TN HB1965 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Clarksville to allow golf carts on certain public roads, if the roads are closed to motor vehicle traffic, within the boundaries of a certain retail and entertainment district upon the adoption of an ordinance by a two-thirds vote. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 55, Chapter 8, relative to golf carts on certain public roadways within a retail and entertainment district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772 | |
2022-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1928 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022