TN HB1959 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1044
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1044
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, abolishes the TBI drug chemistry unit drug testing fund and the TBI toxicology unit intoxicant testing fund; provides for funds collected from the drug testing fee and the blood alcohol or drug concentration test fee being directed to the general fund to be used as appropriated by the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 39, Chapter 16; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 40, Chapter 35; Title 55; Title 63; Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, abolishes the TBI drug chemistry unit drug testing fund and the TBI toxicology unit intoxicant testing fund; provides for funds collected from the drug testing fee and the blood alcohol or drug concentration test fee being directed to the general fund to be used as appropriated by the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 39, Chapter 16; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 40, Chapter 35; Title 55; Title 63; Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1044 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0937) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1076) |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1974 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1044