TN HB1959 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, includes handgun carry permits in definition of "motor vehicle record" for purposes of the "Uniform Motor Vehicle Records Disclosure Act." - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 25, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, includes handgun carry permits in definition of "motor vehicle record" for purposes of the "Uniform Motor Vehicle Records Disclosure Act." - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 25, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Bass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1932 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1959&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1959.pdf |