TN HB1956 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds a representative for military veteran recipients to be appointed as a member of the statewide planning and policy council. - Amends TCA Section 33-1-401.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds a representative for military veteran recipients to be appointed as a member of the statewide planning and policy council. - Amends TCA Section 33-1-401.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 732
2018-04-02HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-29HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/2/2018
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-02-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-14HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 2/20/2018
2018-02-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-29HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1927 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 732

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback