TN HB1955 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises various provisions relating to public charter schools authorized by the achievement school district. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, revises various provisions relating to public charter schools authorized by the achievement school district. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |