TN HB1947 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "playground" for purposes of sexual offender restrictions as any indoor or outdoor facility that is intended for recreation of children and owned by the state, a local government, or a not-for-profit organization. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, defines "playground" for purposes of sexual offender restrictions as any indoor or outdoor facility that is intended for recreation of children and owned by the state, a local government, or a not-for-profit organization. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 643 | |
2018-04-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0697) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0711) |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1920 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 643