TN HB1944 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, excludes local education agencies, public schools, and employees and private contractors of LEAs or public schools from the exception to certain obscenity offenses if the LEA, public school, employee, or private contractor possesses obscene material that is harmful to minors on public school premises; prohibits an LEA or public school from making obscene materials or materials harmful to minors available to students in the school libraries controlled by the LEA or public school. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 9 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 9 and Title 49, relative to obscenity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO LIMIT DEBATE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO LIMIT DEBATE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 63, Nays 24, PNV 0 |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0657) |
2022-03-28 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0768) |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration |
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee -- Education Administration Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1944 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.