TN HB1934 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of knowingly selling, loaning, or making a gift of a firearm to a minor for the purpose of inducing or coercing the minor to commit an offense; subjects a person convicted for such offense to civil liability for any criminal act committed by the minor. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 4; Title 37 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 4; Title 37 and Title 39, relative to firearms offenses involving minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1852 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee