TN HB1932 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds emergency medical services personnel to the mandatory retirement age provisions that apply to TCRS members employed as police officers or firefighters with a participating political subdivision. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, adds emergency medical services personnel to the mandatory retirement age provisions that apply to TCRS members employed as police officers or firefighters with a participating political subdivision. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2129 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee