TN HB1929 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the governor from making a decision or obligating the state of Tennessee in any way with regard to resettlement of refugees unless authorized by joint resolution of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the governor from making a decision or obligating the state of Tennessee in any way with regard to resettlement of refugees unless authorized by joint resolution of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseReset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-01HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 6/4/2020
2020-05-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 5/28/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-01-31HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2020-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-27HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2730 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback