TN HB1927 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes circumstances under healthcare facilities and mental healthcare facilities may differentiate between licensed physicians based on a physician's maintenance of certification in medical staff privileging and credentialing; establishes other requirements in regard to maintenance of certification. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56, Chapter 7 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, establishes circumstances under healthcare facilities and mental healthcare facilities may differentiate between licensed physicians based on a physician's maintenance of certification in medical staff privileging and credentialing; establishes other requirements in regard to maintenance of certification. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56, Chapter 7 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. John Holsclaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 694 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0645) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0759) |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1824 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694