TN HB1923 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires persons working with certain electrical equipment to meet certain requirements; makes that electrical equipment subject to inspection by the state electrical inspector; prohibits liability against certain electric systems arising from those persons working with that electrical equipment; requires copies of the national standards to be available for public viewing. - Amends TCA Section 68-101-104.
Title
As introduced, requires persons working with certain electrical equipment to meet certain requirements; makes that electrical equipment subject to inspection by the state electrical inspector; prohibits liability against certain electric systems arising from those persons working with that electrical equipment; requires copies of the national standards to be available for public viewing. - Amends TCA Section 68-101-104.
Sponsors
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Utilities Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Reassigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1991 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0