TN HB1923 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a person licensed to offer flex loans to recover from a defaulting customer collection and court costs without referring the matter to an attorney if the flex loan plan or secured plan provides for the recovery of those costs. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 12.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a person licensed to offer flex loans to recover from a defaulting customer collection and court costs without referring the matter to an attorney if the flex loan plan or secured plan provides for the recovery of those costs. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1917 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-15 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/22/2016
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1923&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1923.pdf |