TN HB1914 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Failed In s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Failed In s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits local governmental entity from regulating private passenger-for-hire vehicle transportation services with respect to a minimum fare or dispatch time or requiring vehicle to be dispatched from a central physical location. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10 and Title 65, Chapter 15, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, prohibits local governmental entity from regulating private passenger-for-hire vehicle transportation services with respect to a minimum fare or dispatch time or requiring vehicle to be dispatched from a central physical location. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10 and Title 65, Chapter 15, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Failed In s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.