TN HB1913 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises the manner in which the department may dispose of the unclaimed body of an inmate who dies in a penitentiary, including by way of cremation. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 41, Chapter 21, relative to deceased prisoners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-04 Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
2022-05-04 Pub. Ch. 933
2022-04-29 Signed by Governor.
2022-04-19HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2022-04-18SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2022-04-14HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2022-04-14HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2022-04-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1
2022-04-13SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0886)
2022-04-13SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2022-03-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2022-03-15HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2022-03-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2022-03-14HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2022-03-14HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0622)
2022-03-10HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022
2022-03-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022
2022-03-08HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2022-03-02HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2022
2022-03-01HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2022-02-23HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/1/2022
2022-02-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Corrections Subcommittee to 3/1/2022
2022-02-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 2/22/2022
2022-01-28HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2022-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2022-01-26HouseIntro., P1C.
2022-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1866 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 933

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback