TN HB1905 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires hospitals, clinics, and persons, including doctors and nurses, who are called upon to render aid to a person suffering from the effects of a fatal drug overdose to report the drug overdose to the appropriate chief of police or sheriff and district attorney general, to the extent allowed by state and federal law. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to drug overdoses.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1094 | |
2022-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1891 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022