TN HB1903 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 865
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, designates live, interactive webinars as in-person courses for the purposes of continuing education requirements. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 5, relative to dental hygienists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 865
2022-04-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2022-04-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2022-03-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022
2022-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022
2022-03-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2022-03-02HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2022
2022-03-01HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2022-02-23HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2022
2022-02-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/1/2022
2022-02-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/22/2022
2022-01-26HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2022-01-26HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2022-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2022-01-20HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1827 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback