TN HB1901 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the granting of a temporary permit to teach a physical education class, special education course, or course for which an end-of-course examination is required; authorizes endorsement exemption to a teacher to teach any course or subject area, except a physical education class or a special education course, for the 2022-2023 and 2023-2024 school years; revises other related provisions; requires the department of education to report certain information regarding endorsement exemptions and temporary permits. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to qualifications required to teach.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 932 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0813) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 17, PNV 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0638) |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1863 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 932