TN HB1893 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the current sales tax exemption on motor vehicles purchased by members of the armed forces to Tennessee national guard military technicians and members of the Tennessee national guard who are on part-time duty; applies to one vehicle purchased during a five-year period. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-303.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-6-303, relative to exemption from sales tax on motor vehicles for certain Tennessee national guard members and employees.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1787 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022