TN HB1893 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires absentee ballot counting boards to tabulate the results of early and absentee voting at the time the polls are statutorily required to close; requires the absentee ballot counting board to publicly announce the results immediately upon completing the tabulations, even if voters in the county are still waiting in line to vote. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires absentee ballot counting boards to tabulate the results of early and absentee voting at the time the polls are statutorily required to close; requires the absentee ballot counting board to publicly announce the results immediately upon completing the tabulations, even if voters in the county are still waiting in line to vote. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Reassigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/12/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1772 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee