TN HB1889 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds "occupational therapy" to definition of alternative treatments for the purpose of treating patients with opioids. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-164.
Title
As introduced, adds "occupational therapy" to definition of alternative treatments for the purpose of treating patients with opioids. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-164.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2839 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee