TN HB1888 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county election commissions to verify with the Electronic Registration Information Center (ERIC) that persons are no longer qualified to vote before purging the voter registration of such persons; authorizes same day voter registration for qualified voters to register or have their registration updated and be able to vote beginning on the first day of any period of early voting through the day of an election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. Jason Hodges [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Withdrawn. |
2022-02-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1853 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee