TN HB1880 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires public charter schools receiving identification as a priority school to develop a school improvement plan within 90 days of identification; revokes a charter school agreement or denies renewal of the agreement if the charter school remains a priority school for two consecutive cycles. - Amends TCA Section 49-13-122.
Title
As introduced, requires public charter schools receiving identification as a priority school to develop a school improvement plan within 90 days of identification; revokes a charter school agreement or denies renewal of the agreement if the charter school remains a priority school for two consecutive cycles. - Amends TCA Section 49-13-122.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2327 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee