TN HB1874 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates Sand Creek Farm as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, designates Sand Creek Farm as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Withdrawn. |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1826 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Withdrawn.