TN HB1873 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a person selling or offering for sale goods or services at retail from requiring a buyer to pay using credit; requires a person selling or offering for sale goods or services at retail to accept legal tender when offered by the buyer as payment; violations treated as prohibited practice under Tennessee Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to payments by consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - HOUSE BANKING AND CONSUMER AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1858 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee