TN HB1873 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows a court to issue an emergency protection order upon a finding that a person poses an imminent risk of harm to the person or others if allowed to purchase or possess a firearm; authorizes a family member, household member, intimate partner, or law enforcement officer to petition for such an order. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows a court to issue an emergency protection order upon a finding that a person poses an imminent risk of harm to the person or others if allowed to purchase or possess a firearm; authorizes a family member, household member, intimate partner, or law enforcement officer to petition for such an order. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-18HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2020-01-29HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-01-27HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1807 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback