TN HB1871 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits governmental entities, local education agencies, schools, and private businesses from adopting or enforcing laws, rules, or practices that fail to recognize acquired immunity as providing a level of immune protection that is at least as protective as a COVID-19 vaccine or treat individuals with acquired immunity differently than individuals who have received the COVID-19 vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 14; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 14; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 1 & 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 930 | |
2022-04-29 | Returned by Governor without signature. | |
2022-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-11 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 & 2 Ayes 75, Nays 20 PNV 0 HB1871 |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/11/22 |
2022-04-07 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/7/22 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0743) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0744) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0655) |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Commerce Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1982 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930