TN HB1866 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds as a factor to be considered by the court when determining the best interest of a child, in a proceeding requiring the court to make a custody determination regarding a minor child, whether a parent has failed to pay court-ordered child support for a period of three years or more. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to child custody.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Effective date(s) 03/18/2022 | |
2022-03-30 | Pub. Ch. 671 | |
2022-03-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 5 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0503) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 76, Nays 15, PNV 3 |
2022-02-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0513) |
2022-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 2/9/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1806 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 671