TN HB1863 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any county purchasing direct recording electronic voting systems to ensure that the systems have the capability to create a voter-verifiable paper audit trail for each ballot cast. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, requires any county purchasing direct recording electronic voting systems to ensure that the systems have the capability to create a voter-verifiable paper audit trail for each ballot cast. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2429 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee