TN HB1851 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prevents a municipality from charging a person with a violation of any ordinance prohibiting discharging a firearm within the municipal limits if the person acted in justifiable self-defense or to prevent the commission of a criminal offense when discharging the firearm. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1322.
Title
As enacted, prevents a municipality from charging a person with a violation of any ordinance prohibiting discharging a firearm within the municipal limits if the person acted in justifiable self-defense or to prevent the commission of a criminal offense when discharging the firearm. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1322.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 599 | |
2018-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/23/2018 | |
2018-03-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1910 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599