TN HB1850 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the use of green infrastructure practices within areas that have combined sanitary sewage and storm water systems. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the use of green infrastructure practices within areas that have combined sanitary sewage and storm water systems. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 792 | |
2016-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2417 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 792