TN HB1847 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits the liability of a person or entity that contracts with the department of children's services to provide foster care services to children in the department's custody in the same manner that the department's liability is limited from civil actions or claims filed by the children and families who are the intended or actual recipients of those services; specifies that a claim against the contractor arising from the contractor's provision of foster care continuum services to children in the department's custody must be filed with a court of competent jurisdiction and will not be heard by the claims commission. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 29 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 29 and Title 37, relative to civil liability of certain entities.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 777 | |
2022-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2016 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022